LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB933
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB933
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB933
Action History
Senate
05/12/2020
Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Senate
03/16/2020
Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and HUMAN S.
Senate
03/11/2020
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
02/20/2020
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
02/07/2020
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
Senate
02/06/2020
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.