California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB934 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2020

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2020

Amended

Bill June 18, 2020
Bill April 29, 2020