LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB935
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB935
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB935
Action History
Senate
03/20/2020
March 24 hearing postponed by committee.
Senate
03/05/2020
Set for hearing March 24.
Senate
02/20/2020
Referred to Com. on G.O.
Senate
02/07/2020
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
Senate
02/06/2020
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.