Assembly | 06/29/2020 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2020 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2020 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 3841.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3767.) (June 18). | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | Set for hearing June 18. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2020 | Set for hearing June 9. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2020 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2020 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3612.) (May 28). | ||
Senate | 05/21/2020 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2020 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |