Senate | 05/21/2020 | May 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3569.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2020 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2020 | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2020 | Set for hearing March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2020 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |