LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB990
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB990
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB990
Action History
Senate
05/18/2020
May 14 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
05/08/2020
Set for hearing May 14.
Senate
04/17/2020
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
Senate
02/20/2020
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
Senate
02/13/2020
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
Senate
02/12/2020
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.