Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 4. Page 5510.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
July 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 3849.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3768.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
June 18 hearing: Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3768.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Set for hearing June 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2020
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3621.) (May 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2020
|
Set for hearing May 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2020
|
April 1 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2020
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2020
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|