Assembly | 09/10/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 09/10/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2726.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2381.) (August 30). | ||
Senate | 08/22/2019 | Set for hearing August 30. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2019 | August 12 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 07/12/2019 | Set for hearing August 12. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2019 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 1906.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2019 | Set for hearing July 2. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1418.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2019 | Set for hearing June 4. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING, E. & C.A., and APPR. | ||
Senate | 12/04/2018 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. | ||
Senate | 12/03/2018 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |