Senate | 05/21/2019 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hill. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1109.) (May 16). | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 983.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 847.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., E. & C.A., and APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |