Senate | 06/22/2020 | June 23 hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2020 | Set for hearing June 23. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2020 | June 18 hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | Set for hearing June 18. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2020 | Set for hearing June 9. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2020 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 3632.) (June 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2020 | Set for hearing June 2. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2020 | Referral to Com. on E. & C.A. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/10/2019 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after July 28. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |