Senate | 07/19/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 07/19/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/11/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2628.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 8). | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1005.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2019 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 806.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |