Senate | 04/10/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 37, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1041.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 1). | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 360.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |