California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR21 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 3, 2019

Amended

Bill June 5, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019