Senate | 04/17/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1192.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 391.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |