Senate
|
01/24/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2020
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3116.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2020
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3790.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2020
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2019
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1030.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 773.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|