Senate
|
08/28/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2019
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2237.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2019
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2754.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1005.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 806.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|