California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR33 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 33 CHAPTER 49 Relative to Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 02, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 33, Allen. Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month.This measure would designate April 2019, and every April thereafter, as Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Arts are not only an impressive and important agent for economic development, but also impact societal issues that include health, corrections, housing, immigration, veterans, transportation and education; andWHEREAS, It is imperative for all children and youth in the state to have access to arts education in their schools; andWHEREAS, California is the fifth largest economy in the world, with a creative economy totaling $407.1 billion in 2017; andWHEREAS, California employs a higher number of people in creative industries, such as architecture, entertainment, fashion, media, and publishing, than any other state in the nation, according to the 2018 Otis Report on the Creative Economy of California; andWHEREAS, In a state as diverse as California, the arts serve to give voice to our many communities, spark individual creativity, foster empathy and understanding, spur civic engagement, and serve as a continual source of personal enrichment, inspiration, and growth; andWHEREAS, State support for the arts, arts education, and cultural institutions is crucial in order to achieve equitable access to the arts throughout California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes April 2019, as a significant time to recognize and celebrate the arts, culture, and creativity of all Californians; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature designates April 2019, and every April thereafter, as Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled April 29, 2019 Passed IN Senate April 08, 2019 Passed IN Assembly April 25, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 33Introduced by Senator Allen(Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Chu)March 21, 2019 Relative to Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 33, Allen. Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month.This measure would designate April 2019, and every April thereafter, as Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Arts are not only an impressive and important agent for economic development, but also impact societal issues that include health, corrections, housing, immigration, veterans, transportation and education; andWHEREAS, It is imperative for all children and youth in the state to have access to arts education in their schools; andWHEREAS, California is the fifth largest economy in the world, with a creative economy totaling $407.1 billion in 2017; andWHEREAS, California employs a higher number of people in creative industries, such as architecture, entertainment, fashion, media, and publishing, than any other state in the nation, according to the 2018 Otis Report on the Creative Economy of California; andWHEREAS, In a state as diverse as California, the arts serve to give voice to our many communities, spark individual creativity, foster empathy and understanding, spur civic engagement, and serve as a continual source of personal enrichment, inspiration, and growth; andWHEREAS, State support for the arts, arts education, and cultural institutions is crucial in order to achieve equitable access to the arts throughout California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes April 2019, as a significant time to recognize and celebrate the arts, culture, and creativity of all Californians; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature designates April 2019, and every April thereafter, as Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 33 CHAPTER 49 Relative to Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 02, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 33, Allen. Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month.This measure would designate April 2019, and every April thereafter, as Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled April 29, 2019 Passed IN Senate April 08, 2019 Passed IN Assembly April 25, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 33Introduced by Senator Allen(Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Chu)March 21, 2019 Relative to Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 33, Allen. Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month.This measure would designate April 2019, and every April thereafter, as Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
4+
5+ Enrolled April 29, 2019 Passed IN Senate April 08, 2019 Passed IN Assembly April 25, 2019
6+
7+Enrolled April 29, 2019
8+Passed IN Senate April 08, 2019
9+Passed IN Assembly April 25, 2019
10+
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION
412
513 Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 33
6-CHAPTER 49
14+
15+Introduced by Senator Allen(Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Chu)March 21, 2019
16+
17+Introduced by Senator Allen(Principal coauthor: Assembly Member Chu)
18+March 21, 2019
719
820 Relative to Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month.
9-
10- [ Filed with Secretary of State May 02, 2019. ]
1121
1222 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1323
1424 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1525
1626 SCR 33, Allen. Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month.
1727
1828 This measure would designate April 2019, and every April thereafter, as Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month.
1929
2030 This measure would designate April 2019, and every April thereafter, as Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month.
2131
2232 ## Digest Key
2333
2434 ## Bill Text
2535
2636 WHEREAS, Arts are not only an impressive and important agent for economic development, but also impact societal issues that include health, corrections, housing, immigration, veterans, transportation and education; and
2737
2838 WHEREAS, It is imperative for all children and youth in the state to have access to arts education in their schools; and
2939
3040 WHEREAS, California is the fifth largest economy in the world, with a creative economy totaling $407.1 billion in 2017; and
3141
3242 WHEREAS, California employs a higher number of people in creative industries, such as architecture, entertainment, fashion, media, and publishing, than any other state in the nation, according to the 2018 Otis Report on the Creative Economy of California; and
3343
3444 WHEREAS, In a state as diverse as California, the arts serve to give voice to our many communities, spark individual creativity, foster empathy and understanding, spur civic engagement, and serve as a continual source of personal enrichment, inspiration, and growth; and
3545
3646 WHEREAS, State support for the arts, arts education, and cultural institutions is crucial in order to achieve equitable access to the arts throughout California; now, therefore, be it
3747
3848 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes April 2019, as a significant time to recognize and celebrate the arts, culture, and creativity of all Californians; and be it further
3949
4050 Resolved, That the Legislature designates April 2019, and every April thereafter, as Arts, Culture, and Creativity Month; and be it further
4151
4252 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.