LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR39
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCR39
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR39
Action History
Assembly
04/29/2019
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
04/25/2019
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Senate
04/25/2019
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 822.) Ordered to the Assembly.
Senate
04/24/2019
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Senate
04/22/2019
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
04/08/2019
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.