Senate | 08/19/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2673.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/10/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 9). | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2019 | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1032.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |