California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR47 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 47 CHAPTER 110 Relative to Small Business Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State July 09, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 47, Rubio. California Small Business Month.This measure would declare May as Small Business Month and express the Legislatures support of the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, California is home to the most innovative and competitive firms in the world, placing the state consistently among the top 10 economies; andWHEREAS, Small businesses embody the entrepreneurial spirit that has driven the economy of our state where over one-half of our private sector workforce is employed by small businesses; andWHEREAS, In 2018, there were over 3,900,000 small businesses in this state, representing an overwhelming share of Californias workforce by employing more than 7,000,000 people; andWHEREAS, The 70,350 small firms that exported goods from California generated 43 percent of the states $152 billion in total exports; andWHEREAS, On a national basis, the 30,000,000 small businesses are responsible for creating nearly two out of three new jobs; andWHEREAS, Small businesses are critical to the economic well-being of this state by creating new businesses and employment opportunities and by bringing new and innovative services and products to the marketplace; andWHEREAS, Within the small business community, a growing number of these companies are being started and owned by women, people of color, and immigrants. In 2018, it was estimated that 1,600,000 small businesses were minority-owned; and WHEREAS, The Governor has reaffirmed our commitment to Californias small businesses to thrive and prosper and that supporting small-scale private sector job creators is among our most promising strategies to enhance Californias human capital, expand job opportunities, and increase our competitive advantage in the global marketplace; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature in recognition of the importance of small businesses to the economy of this state declares May as California Small Business Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature adds its support to the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.
1+Enrolled July 01, 2019 Passed IN Senate May 16, 2019 Passed IN Assembly June 27, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 47Introduced by Senators Rubio and AtkinsMay 07, 2019 Relative to Small Business Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 47, Rubio. California Small Business Month.This measure would declare May as Small Business Month and express the Legislatures support of the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, California is home to the most innovative and competitive firms in the world, placing the state consistently among the top 10 economies; andWHEREAS, Small businesses embody the entrepreneurial spirit that has driven the economy of our state where over one-half of our private sector workforce is employed by small businesses; andWHEREAS, In 2018, there were over 3,900,000 small businesses in this state, representing an overwhelming share of Californias workforce by employing more than 7,000,000 people; andWHEREAS, The 70,350 small firms that exported goods from California generated 43 percent of the states $152 billion in total exports; andWHEREAS, On a national basis, the 30,000,000 small businesses are responsible for creating nearly two out of three new jobs; andWHEREAS, Small businesses are critical to the economic well-being of this state by creating new businesses and employment opportunities and by bringing new and innovative services and products to the marketplace; andWHEREAS, Within the small business community, a growing number of these companies are being started and owned by women, people of color, and immigrants. In 2018, it was estimated that 1,600,000 small businesses were minority-owned; and WHEREAS, The Governor has reaffirmed our commitment to Californias small businesses to thrive and prosper and that supporting small-scale private sector job creators is among our most promising strategies to enhance Californias human capital, expand job opportunities, and increase our competitive advantage in the global marketplace; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature in recognition of the importance of small businesses to the economy of this state declares May as California Small Business Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature adds its support to the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.
22
3- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 47 CHAPTER 110 Relative to Small Business Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State July 09, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 47, Rubio. California Small Business Month.This measure would declare May as Small Business Month and express the Legislatures support of the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled July 01, 2019 Passed IN Senate May 16, 2019 Passed IN Assembly June 27, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 47Introduced by Senators Rubio and AtkinsMay 07, 2019 Relative to Small Business Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 47, Rubio. California Small Business Month.This measure would declare May as Small Business Month and express the Legislatures support of the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
44
5- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 47 CHAPTER 110
5+ Enrolled July 01, 2019 Passed IN Senate May 16, 2019 Passed IN Assembly June 27, 2019
6+
7+Enrolled July 01, 2019
8+Passed IN Senate May 16, 2019
9+Passed IN Assembly June 27, 2019
10+
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION
612
713 Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 47
814
9- CHAPTER 110
15+Introduced by Senators Rubio and AtkinsMay 07, 2019
16+
17+Introduced by Senators Rubio and Atkins
18+May 07, 2019
1019
1120 Relative to Small Business Month.
12-
13- [ Filed with Secretary of State July 09, 2019. ]
1421
1522 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1623
1724 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1825
1926 SCR 47, Rubio. California Small Business Month.
2027
2128 This measure would declare May as Small Business Month and express the Legislatures support of the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.
2229
2330 This measure would declare May as Small Business Month and express the Legislatures support of the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.
2431
2532 ## Digest Key
2633
2734 ## Bill Text
2835
2936 WHEREAS, California is home to the most innovative and competitive firms in the world, placing the state consistently among the top 10 economies; and
3037
3138 WHEREAS, Small businesses embody the entrepreneurial spirit that has driven the economy of our state where over one-half of our private sector workforce is employed by small businesses; and
3239
3340 WHEREAS, In 2018, there were over 3,900,000 small businesses in this state, representing an overwhelming share of Californias workforce by employing more than 7,000,000 people; and
3441
3542 WHEREAS, The 70,350 small firms that exported goods from California generated 43 percent of the states $152 billion in total exports; and
3643
3744 WHEREAS, On a national basis, the 30,000,000 small businesses are responsible for creating nearly two out of three new jobs; and
3845
3946 WHEREAS, Small businesses are critical to the economic well-being of this state by creating new businesses and employment opportunities and by bringing new and innovative services and products to the marketplace; and
4047
4148 WHEREAS, Within the small business community, a growing number of these companies are being started and owned by women, people of color, and immigrants. In 2018, it was estimated that 1,600,000 small businesses were minority-owned; and
4249
4350 WHEREAS, The Governor has reaffirmed our commitment to Californias small businesses to thrive and prosper and that supporting small-scale private sector job creators is among our most promising strategies to enhance Californias human capital, expand job opportunities, and increase our competitive advantage in the global marketplace; now, therefore, be it
4451
4552 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature in recognition of the importance of small businesses to the economy of this state declares May as California Small Business Month; and be it further
4653
4754 Resolved, That the Legislature adds its support to the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.