Senate | 06/05/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2129.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 24). | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1057.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |