Senate | 02/22/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 369.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 7). | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 89.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |