Assembly | 06/20/2019 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 746.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 383.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Set for hearing March 20. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |