Assembly | 08/19/2019 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2182.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2019 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/12/2019 | Set for hearing August 12. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2019 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 2096.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |