Senate | 09/09/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2911.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 26). | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2198.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |