Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2020 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2020 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3175.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2020 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2020 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3142.) (January 23). | ||
Senate | 01/21/2020 | Set for hearing January 23. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2020 | January 21 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2020 | Set for hearing January 21. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2020 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3087.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 12/20/2019 | Set for hearing January 14. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |