California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR72 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 72 CHAPTER 157 Relative to First Responder Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 19, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 72, Morrell. First Responder Day.This measure would declare September 23, 2019, as First Responder Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, California is approaching 40,000,000 residents who occupy over 156,000 square miles of land that is prone to earthquakes, fires, floods, severe storms, and other natural disasters, as well as threats of violence and terror; andWHEREAS, California is known for its extraordinary response to these emergencies. Every day, police officers, firefighters, and emergency personnel work as our first line of defense, protecting our communities and ensuring California is the safest place to live, work, and visit; andWHEREAS, The heart of Californias emergency response capability is our force of first responders. No greater courage is demonstrated than that of dedicated and brave first responders who run toward an emergency, rather than away from it. First responders put their lives on the line by protecting and administering care to others in need; andWHEREAS, First responders accept the challenge and responsibility of serving others without a second thought. They selflessly perform their duties without regard for their own safety and provide a superior level of service; andWHEREAS, As a direct result of our first responders extensive training, rapid emergency deployment, and coordinated efforts, lives are saved; andWHEREAS, Every day, the citizens of the State of California rely on the dedicated professionalism of first responders to preserve the peace and secure the safety and well-being of all who live in, and visit, California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares September 23, 2019, as First Responder Day, in honor of the contributions and dedication of first responders; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled September 11, 2019 Passed IN Senate August 30, 2019 Passed IN Assembly September 09, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 72Introduced by Senator Morrell(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Chang, Dahle, Dodd, Grove, Monning, Nielsen, and Wilk)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Brough, Chen, Choi, Friedman, Eduardo Garcia, Lackey, and Mathis)August 20, 2019 Relative to First Responder Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 72, Morrell. First Responder Day.This measure would declare September 23, 2019, as First Responder Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, California is approaching 40,000,000 residents who occupy over 156,000 square miles of land that is prone to earthquakes, fires, floods, severe storms, and other natural disasters, as well as threats of violence and terror; andWHEREAS, California is known for its extraordinary response to these emergencies. Every day, police officers, firefighters, and emergency personnel work as our first line of defense, protecting our communities and ensuring California is the safest place to live, work, and visit; andWHEREAS, The heart of Californias emergency response capability is our force of first responders. No greater courage is demonstrated than that of dedicated and brave first responders who run toward an emergency, rather than away from it. First responders put their lives on the line by protecting and administering care to others in need; andWHEREAS, First responders accept the challenge and responsibility of serving others without a second thought. They selflessly perform their duties without regard for their own safety and provide a superior level of service; andWHEREAS, As a direct result of our first responders extensive training, rapid emergency deployment, and coordinated efforts, lives are saved; andWHEREAS, Every day, the citizens of the State of California rely on the dedicated professionalism of first responders to preserve the peace and secure the safety and well-being of all who live in, and visit, California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares September 23, 2019, as First Responder Day, in honor of the contributions and dedication of first responders; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 72 CHAPTER 157 Relative to First Responder Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 19, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 72, Morrell. First Responder Day.This measure would declare September 23, 2019, as First Responder Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled September 11, 2019 Passed IN Senate August 30, 2019 Passed IN Assembly September 09, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 72Introduced by Senator Morrell(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Chang, Dahle, Dodd, Grove, Monning, Nielsen, and Wilk)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Brough, Chen, Choi, Friedman, Eduardo Garcia, Lackey, and Mathis)August 20, 2019 Relative to First Responder Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 72, Morrell. First Responder Day.This measure would declare September 23, 2019, as First Responder Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
44
5- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 72 CHAPTER 157
5+ Enrolled September 11, 2019 Passed IN Senate August 30, 2019 Passed IN Assembly September 09, 2019
66
7- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 72
7+Enrolled September 11, 2019
8+Passed IN Senate August 30, 2019
9+Passed IN Assembly September 09, 2019
810
9- CHAPTER 157
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION
12+
13+ Senate Concurrent Resolution
14+
15+No. 72
16+
17+Introduced by Senator Morrell(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Chang, Dahle, Dodd, Grove, Monning, Nielsen, and Wilk)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Brough, Chen, Choi, Friedman, Eduardo Garcia, Lackey, and Mathis)August 20, 2019
18+
19+Introduced by Senator Morrell(Coauthors: Senators Bates, Chang, Dahle, Dodd, Grove, Monning, Nielsen, and Wilk)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Brough, Chen, Choi, Friedman, Eduardo Garcia, Lackey, and Mathis)
20+August 20, 2019
1021
1122 Relative to First Responder Day.
12-
13- [ Filed with Secretary of State September 19, 2019. ]
1423
1524 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1625
1726 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1827
1928 SCR 72, Morrell. First Responder Day.
2029
2130 This measure would declare September 23, 2019, as First Responder Day.
2231
2332 This measure would declare September 23, 2019, as First Responder Day.
2433
2534 ## Digest Key
2635
2736 ## Bill Text
2837
2938 WHEREAS, California is approaching 40,000,000 residents who occupy over 156,000 square miles of land that is prone to earthquakes, fires, floods, severe storms, and other natural disasters, as well as threats of violence and terror; and
3039
3140 WHEREAS, California is known for its extraordinary response to these emergencies. Every day, police officers, firefighters, and emergency personnel work as our first line of defense, protecting our communities and ensuring California is the safest place to live, work, and visit; and
3241
3342 WHEREAS, The heart of Californias emergency response capability is our force of first responders. No greater courage is demonstrated than that of dedicated and brave first responders who run toward an emergency, rather than away from it. First responders put their lives on the line by protecting and administering care to others in need; and
3443
3544 WHEREAS, First responders accept the challenge and responsibility of serving others without a second thought. They selflessly perform their duties without regard for their own safety and provide a superior level of service; and
3645
3746 WHEREAS, As a direct result of our first responders extensive training, rapid emergency deployment, and coordinated efforts, lives are saved; and
3847
3948 WHEREAS, Every day, the citizens of the State of California rely on the dedicated professionalism of first responders to preserve the peace and secure the safety and well-being of all who live in, and visit, California; now, therefore, be it
4049
4150 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares September 23, 2019, as First Responder Day, in honor of the contributions and dedication of first responders; and be it further
4251
4352 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.