Senate | 09/19/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 09/19/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3210.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 5). | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2329.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2019 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |