Senate | 09/11/2020 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2020. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2020 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2020 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2020 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5278.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2020 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10). | ||
Assembly | 07/28/2020 | July 28 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2020 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2020 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3688.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2020 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2020 | Set for hearing June 9. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2020 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3623.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2020 | Set for hearing May 29. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2020 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |