Senate
|
09/11/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2020
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5301.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Assembly Rule 63 and 74(d) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2020
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4385.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2020
|
Set for hearing August 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2020
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 1. Page 4076.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/27/2020
|
Set for hearing August 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2020
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|