LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR10
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SJR10
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR10
Action History
Assembly
01/21/2020
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Senate
01/21/2020
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 3117.) Ordered to the Assembly.
Senate
01/14/2020
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3087.) (January 14).
Senate
01/07/2020
Set for hearing January 14.
Senate
07/10/2019
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Senate
07/02/2019
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.