Assembly | 09/09/2019 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 26. Noes 2. Page 2326.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2320.) (August 29). | ||
Senate | 08/29/2019 | Set for hearing August 29. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |