Assembly | 06/11/2020 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3681.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2020 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3561.) (May 19). | ||
Senate | 05/12/2020 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2020 | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2020 | Set for hearing March 24. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2020 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |