Senate | 08/19/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2668.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 948.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 801.) (April 24). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |