Senate | 07/09/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2492.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 924.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 801.) (April 24). | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |