Senate | 06/28/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2402.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18). | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2019 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 963.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 625.) (April 9). | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |