California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR10 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 01/22/2019

                            Enrolled  January 22, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  January 18, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 10Introduced by Senator HertzbergJanuary 10, 2019 Relative to the 25th Anniversary of the Northridge Earthquake of 1994. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 10, Hertzberg. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, On January 17, 1994, at 4:30 a.m. in the San Fernando Valley region of the County of Los Angeles, a 6.7 magnitude earthquake hit; andWHEREAS, The shaking lasted up to 10 to 20 seconds and was felt as far away as San Diego and Las Vegas; andWHEREAS, As aftershocks continued, parts of the city were in ruins within minutes; homes disappeared, fires erupted, businesses fell, and parking structures crumbled; andWHEREAS, At least 60 people died and more than 9,000 were injured, and more than 20,000 people were displaced from their homes; andWHEREAS, Among the wreckage in the aftermath of the earthquake were 7,000 single-family homes, 5,000 mobilehomes, and about 49,000 apartments that were destroyed or severely damaged, and 57,000 single-family homes suffered substantial damage from shaking and subsequent fires; andWHEREAS, In total, more than 100,000 homes suffered significant damage from the earthquake and its aftermath, and more than 125,000 people experienced temporary homelessness; andWHEREAS, Five days after the earthquake, it was estimated that between 40,000 and 60,000 residents were still without public water; andWHEREAS, Seven freeway bridges collapsed and 212 other bridges were damaged; andWHEREAS, The earthquake sparked fires and affected communication, water, and power systems; andWHEREAS, The direct cause of the earthquake was a previously unknown fault 9 miles beneath Northridge, a town in the San Fernando Valley; andWHEREAS, The Northridge earthquake currently stands as the most expensive earthquake in the nations history and the fifth costliest natural disaster in United States history, with over $40 billion in property damages; andWHEREAS, More than 681,000 residents and businesses applied for federal disaster aid, a state record according to the Office of Emergency Services; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate intends to continue to study, plan, prepare, support, and fund future actions that will strengthen the states ability to anticipate, withstand, and respond to, the next major earthquakes, which inevitably will occur, and that the Senate hereby states its intent that the lessons learned from past earthquakes be applied to the States preparedness and emergency response efforts; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  January 22, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  January 18, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 10Introduced by Senator HertzbergJanuary 10, 2019 Relative to the 25th Anniversary of the Northridge Earthquake of 1994. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 10, Hertzberg. Digest Key

 Enrolled  January 22, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  January 18, 2019

Enrolled  January 22, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  January 18, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 10

Introduced by Senator HertzbergJanuary 10, 2019

Introduced by Senator Hertzberg
January 10, 2019

 Relative to the 25th Anniversary of the Northridge Earthquake of 1994. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 10, Hertzberg. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, On January 17, 1994, at 4:30 a.m. in the San Fernando Valley region of the County of Los Angeles, a 6.7 magnitude earthquake hit; and

WHEREAS, The shaking lasted up to 10 to 20 seconds and was felt as far away as San Diego and Las Vegas; and

WHEREAS, As aftershocks continued, parts of the city were in ruins within minutes; homes disappeared, fires erupted, businesses fell, and parking structures crumbled; and

WHEREAS, At least 60 people died and more than 9,000 were injured, and more than 20,000 people were displaced from their homes; and

WHEREAS, Among the wreckage in the aftermath of the earthquake were 7,000 single-family homes, 5,000 mobilehomes, and about 49,000 apartments that were destroyed or severely damaged, and 57,000 single-family homes suffered substantial damage from shaking and subsequent fires; and

WHEREAS, In total, more than 100,000 homes suffered significant damage from the earthquake and its aftermath, and more than 125,000 people experienced temporary homelessness; and

WHEREAS, Five days after the earthquake, it was estimated that between 40,000 and 60,000 residents were still without public water; and

WHEREAS, Seven freeway bridges collapsed and 212 other bridges were damaged; and

WHEREAS, The earthquake sparked fires and affected communication, water, and power systems; and

WHEREAS, The direct cause of the earthquake was a previously unknown fault 9 miles beneath Northridge, a town in the San Fernando Valley; and

WHEREAS, The Northridge earthquake currently stands as the most expensive earthquake in the nations history and the fifth costliest natural disaster in United States history, with over $40 billion in property damages; and

WHEREAS, More than 681,000 residents and businesses applied for federal disaster aid, a state record according to the Office of Emergency Services; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate intends to continue to study, plan, prepare, support, and fund future actions that will strengthen the states ability to anticipate, withstand, and respond to, the next major earthquakes, which inevitably will occur, and that the Senate hereby states its intent that the lessons learned from past earthquakes be applied to the States preparedness and emergency response efforts; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.