California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR13 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/05/2019

                            Enrolled  February 05, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  February 04, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 13Introduced by Senators Durazo and RubioJanuary 23, 2019 Relative to Wear Red Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 13, Durazo. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Cardiovascular diseases are the number one killer of women in the United States; andWHEREAS, Cardiovascular diseases and stroke kill one woman every 80 seconds in the United States; andWHEREAS, About 80 percent of cardiovascular diseases may be prevented; andWHEREAS, Risk factors for heart disease, such as blood pressure, smoking, and cholesterol can be controlled; andWHEREAS, Women are encouraged to commit to making physical activity and healthy eating a priority to improve their heart health; andWHEREAS, The American Heart Associations Go Red For Women movement motivates women to learn their family history, and to meet with a health care provider to determine their risk for cardiovascular diseases and stroke; andWHEREAS, The Go Red For Women movement encourages women to take charge of their heart health by becoming familiar with their total cholesterol, high-density lipoprotein cholesterol, blood pressure, blood sugar, and body mass index; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes the month of February 2019 as American Heart Month in California in order to raise awareness of the importance of the ongoing fight against heart disease and stroke; and be it furtherResolved, That the Senate recognizes February 1, 2019, as Wear Red Day in California, and urges all citizens to show their support for women and the fight against heart disease by commemorating this day by wearing the color red. By increasing awareness, speaking up about heart disease, and empowering women to reduce their risk for cardiovascular disease, we can save thousands of lives each year; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  February 05, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  February 04, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 13Introduced by Senators Durazo and RubioJanuary 23, 2019 Relative to Wear Red Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 13, Durazo. Digest Key

 Enrolled  February 05, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  February 04, 2019

Enrolled  February 05, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  February 04, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 13

Introduced by Senators Durazo and RubioJanuary 23, 2019

Introduced by Senators Durazo and Rubio
January 23, 2019

 Relative to Wear Red Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 13, Durazo. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Cardiovascular diseases are the number one killer of women in the United States; and

WHEREAS, Cardiovascular diseases and stroke kill one woman every 80 seconds in the United States; and

WHEREAS, About 80 percent of cardiovascular diseases may be prevented; and

WHEREAS, Risk factors for heart disease, such as blood pressure, smoking, and cholesterol can be controlled; and

WHEREAS, Women are encouraged to commit to making physical activity and healthy eating a priority to improve their heart health; and

WHEREAS, The American Heart Associations Go Red For Women movement motivates women to learn their family history, and to meet with a health care provider to determine their risk for cardiovascular diseases and stroke; and

WHEREAS, The Go Red For Women movement encourages women to take charge of their heart health by becoming familiar with their total cholesterol, high-density lipoprotein cholesterol, blood pressure, blood sugar, and body mass index; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate recognizes the month of February 2019 as American Heart Month in California in order to raise awareness of the importance of the ongoing fight against heart disease and stroke; and be it further

Resolved, That the Senate recognizes February 1, 2019, as Wear Red Day in California, and urges all citizens to show their support for women and the fight against heart disease by commemorating this day by wearing the color red. By increasing awareness, speaking up about heart disease, and empowering women to reduce their risk for cardiovascular disease, we can save thousands of lives each year; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.