California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR14 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/16/2019

                            Enrolled  August 16, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  August 15, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 14Introduced by Senator ChangJanuary 28, 2019 Relative to Korean Independence Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 14, Chang. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, August 15, 2019, marks the 74th anniversary of the Independence of the Republic of Korea; andWHEREAS, Korean Independence Day or Gwangbokjeol, commemorates the liberation of Korea from Japanese colonization on August 15, 1945; andWHEREAS, The thousands of brave Korean service members and civilians who lost their lives or were imprisoned fighting for independence are a testament to the Republic of Koreas enduring strength and resiliency; and WHEREAS, On Korean Independence Day, Koreans throughout the world unite to commemorate this day through parades, concerts, and celebrations that showcase Koreas rich cultural heritage; and WHEREAS, California is home to more than 455,000 Korean Americans who celebrate this important holiday; and WHEREAS, The Korean American community has enriched the cultural, social, and economic landscape of California; and WHEREAS, Korean Independence Day is an opportunity to celebrate the great contributions of Korean Americans to the United States; and WHEREAS, The Republic of Korea and the United States are historic allies that share common values and objectives through economic interdependence and security; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That August 15, 2019, is hereby commemorated as Korean Independence Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  August 16, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  August 15, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 14Introduced by Senator ChangJanuary 28, 2019 Relative to Korean Independence Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 14, Chang. Digest Key

 Enrolled  August 16, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  August 15, 2019

Enrolled  August 16, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  August 15, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 14

Introduced by Senator ChangJanuary 28, 2019

Introduced by Senator Chang
January 28, 2019

 Relative to Korean Independence Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 14, Chang. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, August 15, 2019, marks the 74th anniversary of the Independence of the Republic of Korea; and

WHEREAS, Korean Independence Day or Gwangbokjeol, commemorates the liberation of Korea from Japanese colonization on August 15, 1945; and

WHEREAS, The thousands of brave Korean service members and civilians who lost their lives or were imprisoned fighting for independence are a testament to the Republic of Koreas enduring strength and resiliency; and 

WHEREAS, On Korean Independence Day, Koreans throughout the world unite to commemorate this day through parades, concerts, and celebrations that showcase Koreas rich cultural heritage; and 

WHEREAS, California is home to more than 455,000 Korean Americans who celebrate this important holiday; and 

WHEREAS, The Korean American community has enriched the cultural, social, and economic landscape of California; and 

WHEREAS, Korean Independence Day is an opportunity to celebrate the great contributions of Korean Americans to the United States; and 

WHEREAS, The Republic of Korea and the United States are historic allies that share common values and objectives through economic interdependence and security; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That August 15, 2019, is hereby commemorated as Korean Independence Day; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.