Senate | 02/19/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 185.) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |