Senate | 05/13/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1023.) | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | From inactive file on motion of Senator Wilk. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Wilk. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |