Enrolled May 07, 2019 Passed IN Senate May 06, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 34Introduced by Senator CaballeroApril 25, 2019 Relative to National Nurses Week.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 34, Caballero. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Nurses are the people responsible for the treatment, safety, and recovery of all acutely or chronically ill persons, and nurses understand the complexities of an illness; andWHEREAS, According to the California Health Care Foundation, California is home to more than 330,000 actively licensed registered nurses (RNs), and nurses make the single largest health profession in the state; andWHEREAS, Nurses are at the front line of administering and evaluating treatments, and everyday medicine would not exist without nurses; andWHEREAS, According to the United States Bureau of Labor Statistics, nursing employment opportunities are projected to increase by 16% by the year 2024, which is much faster than average; andWHEREAS, Although Californias RN workforce remains predominantly female, in recent years, more men have been entering the RN workforce. The share of men working in the RN workforce within this state has more than doubled between 1993 and 2008; andWHEREAS, Californias RN workforce has become increasingly racially and ethnically diverse over the past two decades. Since 1990, the population of nurses of color increased from 23% to 41%; andWHEREAS, In 1954, the first National Nurses Week was observed during the period of October 11 through 16, and the week also honored the 100th anniversary of Florence Nightingales work in Crimea; andWHEREAS, In 1974, President Nixon declared the first official National Nurses Week in the month of February; andWHEREAS, In 1974, the International Council of Nurses officially proclaimed May 12 as International Nurses Day; andWHEREAS, In 1990, the American Nurses Association introduced National Nurses Week; andWHEREAS, In 1993, the Board of Directors of the American Nurses Association recognized May 6 through 12 as a time to observe National Nurses Week, which commenced in 1994 and has been celebrated in the following years; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby acknowledges the week of May 6, 2019, to May 12, 2019, as National Nurses Week, and encourages the people of the State of California to recognize and support the work of our nurses in their communities, schools, hospitals, and throughout the health sector; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. Enrolled May 07, 2019 Passed IN Senate May 06, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 34Introduced by Senator CaballeroApril 25, 2019 Relative to National Nurses Week.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 34, Caballero. Digest Key Enrolled May 07, 2019 Passed IN Senate May 06, 2019 Enrolled May 07, 2019 Passed IN Senate May 06, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 34 Introduced by Senator CaballeroApril 25, 2019 Introduced by Senator Caballero April 25, 2019 Relative to National Nurses Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SR 34, Caballero. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text WHEREAS, Nurses are the people responsible for the treatment, safety, and recovery of all acutely or chronically ill persons, and nurses understand the complexities of an illness; and WHEREAS, According to the California Health Care Foundation, California is home to more than 330,000 actively licensed registered nurses (RNs), and nurses make the single largest health profession in the state; and WHEREAS, Nurses are at the front line of administering and evaluating treatments, and everyday medicine would not exist without nurses; and WHEREAS, According to the United States Bureau of Labor Statistics, nursing employment opportunities are projected to increase by 16% by the year 2024, which is much faster than average; and WHEREAS, Although Californias RN workforce remains predominantly female, in recent years, more men have been entering the RN workforce. The share of men working in the RN workforce within this state has more than doubled between 1993 and 2008; and WHEREAS, Californias RN workforce has become increasingly racially and ethnically diverse over the past two decades. Since 1990, the population of nurses of color increased from 23% to 41%; and WHEREAS, In 1954, the first National Nurses Week was observed during the period of October 11 through 16, and the week also honored the 100th anniversary of Florence Nightingales work in Crimea; and WHEREAS, In 1974, President Nixon declared the first official National Nurses Week in the month of February; and WHEREAS, In 1974, the International Council of Nurses officially proclaimed May 12 as International Nurses Day; and WHEREAS, In 1990, the American Nurses Association introduced National Nurses Week; and WHEREAS, In 1993, the Board of Directors of the American Nurses Association recognized May 6 through 12 as a time to observe National Nurses Week, which commenced in 1994 and has been celebrated in the following years; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby acknowledges the week of May 6, 2019, to May 12, 2019, as National Nurses Week, and encourages the people of the State of California to recognize and support the work of our nurses in their communities, schools, hospitals, and throughout the health sector; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.