California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR34 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Enrolled May 07, 2019 Passed IN Senate May 06, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 34Introduced by Senator CaballeroApril 25, 2019 Relative to National Nurses Week.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 34, Caballero. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Nurses are the people responsible for the treatment, safety, and recovery of all acutely or chronically ill persons, and nurses understand the complexities of an illness; andWHEREAS, According to the California Health Care Foundation, California is home to more than 330,000 actively licensed registered nurses (RNs), and nurses make the single largest health profession in the state; andWHEREAS, Nurses are at the front line of administering and evaluating treatments, and everyday medicine would not exist without nurses; andWHEREAS, According to the United States Bureau of Labor Statistics, nursing employment opportunities are projected to increase by 16% by the year 2024, which is much faster than average; andWHEREAS, Although Californias RN workforce remains predominantly female, in recent years, more men have been entering the RN workforce. The share of men working in the RN workforce within this state has more than doubled between 1993 and 2008; andWHEREAS, Californias RN workforce has become increasingly racially and ethnically diverse over the past two decades. Since 1990, the population of nurses of color increased from 23% to 41%; andWHEREAS, In 1954, the first National Nurses Week was observed during the period of October 11 through 16, and the week also honored the 100th anniversary of Florence Nightingales work in Crimea; andWHEREAS, In 1974, President Nixon declared the first official National Nurses Week in the month of February; andWHEREAS, In 1974, the International Council of Nurses officially proclaimed May 12 as International Nurses Day; andWHEREAS, In 1990, the American Nurses Association introduced National Nurses Week; andWHEREAS, In 1993, the Board of Directors of the American Nurses Association recognized May 6 through 12 as a time to observe National Nurses Week, which commenced in 1994 and has been celebrated in the following years; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby acknowledges the week of May 6, 2019, to May 12, 2019, as National Nurses Week, and encourages the people of the State of California to recognize and support the work of our nurses in their communities, schools, hospitals, and throughout the health sector; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 34Introduced by Senator CaballeroApril 25, 2019 Relative to National Nurses Week.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 34, as introduced, Caballero. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Nurses are the people responsible for the treatment, safety, and recovery of all acutely or chronically ill persons, and nurses understand the complexities of an illness; andWHEREAS, According to the California Health Care Foundation, California is home to more than 330,000 actively licensed registered nurses (RNs), and nurses make the single largest health profession in the state; andWHEREAS, Nurses are at the front line of administering and evaluating treatments, and everyday medicine would not exist without nurses; andWHEREAS, According to the United States Bureau of Labor Statistics, nursing employment opportunities are projected to increase by 16% by the year 2024, which is much faster than average; andWHEREAS, Although Californias RN workforce remains predominantly female, in recent years, more men have been entering the RN workforce. The share of men working in the RN workforce within this state has more than doubled between 1993 and 2008; andWHEREAS, Californias RN workforce has become increasingly racially and ethnically diverse over the past two decades. Since 1990, the population of nurses of color increased from 23% to 41%; andWHEREAS, In 1954, the first National Nurses Week was observed during the period of October 11 through 16, and the week also honored the 100th anniversary of Florence Nightingales work in Crimea; andWHEREAS, In 1974, President Nixon declared the first official National Nurses Week in the month of February; andWHEREAS, In 1974, the International Council of Nurses officially proclaimed May 12 as International Nurses Day; andWHEREAS, In 1990, the American Nurses Association introduced National Nurses Week; andWHEREAS, In 1993, the Board of Directors of the American Nurses Association recognized May 6 through 12 as a time to observe National Nurses Week, which commenced in 1994 and has been celebrated in the following years; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby acknowledges the week of May 6, 2019, to May 12, 2019, as National Nurses Week, and encourages the people of the State of California to recognize and support the work of our nurses in their communities, schools, hospitals, and throughout the health sector; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Enrolled May 07, 2019 Passed IN Senate May 06, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 34Introduced by Senator CaballeroApril 25, 2019 Relative to National Nurses Week.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 34, Caballero. Digest Key
3+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 34Introduced by Senator CaballeroApril 25, 2019 Relative to National Nurses Week.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 34, as introduced, Caballero. Digest Key
44
5- Enrolled May 07, 2019 Passed IN Senate May 06, 2019
65
7-Enrolled May 07, 2019
8-Passed IN Senate May 06, 2019
6+
7+
98
109 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION
1110
1211 Senate Resolution No. 34
1312
1413 Introduced by Senator CaballeroApril 25, 2019
1514
1615 Introduced by Senator Caballero
1716 April 25, 2019
1817
1918 Relative to National Nurses Week.
2019
2120 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
2221
2322 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
2423
25-SR 34, Caballero.
24+SR 34, as introduced, Caballero.
2625
2726
2827
2928 ## Digest Key
3029
3130 ## Bill Text
3231
3332 WHEREAS, Nurses are the people responsible for the treatment, safety, and recovery of all acutely or chronically ill persons, and nurses understand the complexities of an illness; and
3433
3534 WHEREAS, According to the California Health Care Foundation, California is home to more than 330,000 actively licensed registered nurses (RNs), and nurses make the single largest health profession in the state; and
3635
3736 WHEREAS, Nurses are at the front line of administering and evaluating treatments, and everyday medicine would not exist without nurses; and
3837
3938 WHEREAS, According to the United States Bureau of Labor Statistics, nursing employment opportunities are projected to increase by 16% by the year 2024, which is much faster than average; and
4039
4140 WHEREAS, Although Californias RN workforce remains predominantly female, in recent years, more men have been entering the RN workforce. The share of men working in the RN workforce within this state has more than doubled between 1993 and 2008; and
4241
4342 WHEREAS, Californias RN workforce has become increasingly racially and ethnically diverse over the past two decades. Since 1990, the population of nurses of color increased from 23% to 41%; and
4443
4544 WHEREAS, In 1954, the first National Nurses Week was observed during the period of October 11 through 16, and the week also honored the 100th anniversary of Florence Nightingales work in Crimea; and
4645
4746 WHEREAS, In 1974, President Nixon declared the first official National Nurses Week in the month of February; and
4847
4948 WHEREAS, In 1974, the International Council of Nurses officially proclaimed May 12 as International Nurses Day; and
5049
5150 WHEREAS, In 1990, the American Nurses Association introduced National Nurses Week; and
5251
5352 WHEREAS, In 1993, the Board of Directors of the American Nurses Association recognized May 6 through 12 as a time to observe National Nurses Week, which commenced in 1994 and has been celebrated in the following years; now, therefore, be it
5453
5554 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby acknowledges the week of May 6, 2019, to May 12, 2019, as National Nurses Week, and encourages the people of the State of California to recognize and support the work of our nurses in their communities, schools, hospitals, and throughout the health sector; and be it further
5655
5756 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.