California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR38 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2019

                            Enrolled  May 31, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 30, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 38Introduced by Senator BorgeasMay 02, 2019 Relative to childhood apraxia of speech. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 38, Borgeas. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Childhood apraxia of speech, a neurological speech disorder, affects a childs ability to correctly produce the sounds and syllables that are necessary to form words; andWHEREAS, Children with childhood apraxia of speech understand language and know what they want to say, but have trouble putting thoughts into words that others can consistently understand; andWHEREAS, Without appropriate and timely speech intervention, children are at risk for literacy delays and other educational-related delays; andWHEREAS, Children with childhood apraxia of speech can learn to use their own voices, but only with early intervention and intensive and frequent speech therapy; andWHEREAS, We encourage insurance providers and schools to recognize the critical need to provide adequate speech therapy so that the impact of this disorder can be minimized, and so these children can grow into productive, contributing adults; andWHEREAS, Increasing public awareness about childhood apraxia of speech is imperative, and will serve as a safeguard against educational bias and social stigma and contribute to each affected individuals overall well-being; andWHEREAS, Apraxia Kids, the nations only nonprofit organization dedicated to supporting children with apraxia and their families, will commemorate May 14, 2019, and each May 14 thereafter, as Apraxia Awareness Day; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby recognizes May 14, 2019, as Apraxia Awareness Day in California to enhance public awareness; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  May 31, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 30, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 38Introduced by Senator BorgeasMay 02, 2019 Relative to childhood apraxia of speech. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 38, Borgeas. Digest Key

 Enrolled  May 31, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 30, 2019

Enrolled  May 31, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  May 30, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 38

Introduced by Senator BorgeasMay 02, 2019

Introduced by Senator Borgeas
May 02, 2019

 Relative to childhood apraxia of speech. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 38, Borgeas. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Childhood apraxia of speech, a neurological speech disorder, affects a childs ability to correctly produce the sounds and syllables that are necessary to form words; and

WHEREAS, Children with childhood apraxia of speech understand language and know what they want to say, but have trouble putting thoughts into words that others can consistently understand; and

WHEREAS, Without appropriate and timely speech intervention, children are at risk for literacy delays and other educational-related delays; and

WHEREAS, Children with childhood apraxia of speech can learn to use their own voices, but only with early intervention and intensive and frequent speech therapy; and

WHEREAS, We encourage insurance providers and schools to recognize the critical need to provide adequate speech therapy so that the impact of this disorder can be minimized, and so these children can grow into productive, contributing adults; and

WHEREAS, Increasing public awareness about childhood apraxia of speech is imperative, and will serve as a safeguard against educational bias and social stigma and contribute to each affected individuals overall well-being; and

WHEREAS, Apraxia Kids, the nations only nonprofit organization dedicated to supporting children with apraxia and their families, will commemorate May 14, 2019, and each May 14 thereafter, as Apraxia Awareness Day; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby recognizes May 14, 2019, as Apraxia Awareness Day in California to enhance public awareness; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.