California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR42 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/22/2019

                            Enrolled  May 22, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 20, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 42Introduced by Senator RubioMay 14, 2019 Relative to World Lupus Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 42, Rubio. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Lupus is a severe and unpredictable autoimmune disease that can cause life-threatening damage to any organ in the body; andWHEREAS, Lupus is a global health problem that affects millions of young women, men, and children of all nationalities, races, ethnicities, genders, and ages worldwide; andWHEREAS, There remains low public awareness and understanding of lupus symptoms and health effects relative to its significant impact on the lives of people with lupus; andWHEREAS, Many primary care physicians are not fully aware of all of the signs and symptoms of lupus, causing people with lupus to suffer for many years before they can obtain a diagnosis and begin treatment; andWHEREAS, People with lupus need access to medical specialists and high-quality multidisciplinary care, including emotional, psychological, and social care; andWHEREAS, There is an urgent need to develop tools that will improve patient and physician communications; andWHEREAS, Medical research efforts to find the causes of lupus, create useful tools to monitor disease activity, and develop more targeted and tolerable treatments are underfunded in comparison with diseases of similar magnitude and severity; andWHEREAS, There is a deep, unmet need worldwide to educate and support individuals affected by lupus, including their family members and caregivers; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That May 10, 2019, is hereby recognized as World Lupus Day, on which lupus organizations around the globe call attention to the need for increases in public and private sector funding for medical research on lupus, education programs for health professionals, and improved access to quality medical care for people with lupus; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  May 22, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 20, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 42Introduced by Senator RubioMay 14, 2019 Relative to World Lupus Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 42, Rubio. Digest Key

 Enrolled  May 22, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  May 20, 2019

Enrolled  May 22, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  May 20, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 42

Introduced by Senator RubioMay 14, 2019

Introduced by Senator Rubio
May 14, 2019

 Relative to World Lupus Day. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 42, Rubio. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Lupus is a severe and unpredictable autoimmune disease that can cause life-threatening damage to any organ in the body; and

WHEREAS, Lupus is a global health problem that affects millions of young women, men, and children of all nationalities, races, ethnicities, genders, and ages worldwide; and

WHEREAS, There remains low public awareness and understanding of lupus symptoms and health effects relative to its significant impact on the lives of people with lupus; and

WHEREAS, Many primary care physicians are not fully aware of all of the signs and symptoms of lupus, causing people with lupus to suffer for many years before they can obtain a diagnosis and begin treatment; and

WHEREAS, People with lupus need access to medical specialists and high-quality multidisciplinary care, including emotional, psychological, and social care; and

WHEREAS, There is an urgent need to develop tools that will improve patient and physician communications; and

WHEREAS, Medical research efforts to find the causes of lupus, create useful tools to monitor disease activity, and develop more targeted and tolerable treatments are underfunded in comparison with diseases of similar magnitude and severity; and

WHEREAS, There is a deep, unmet need worldwide to educate and support individuals affected by lupus, including their family members and caregivers; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That May 10, 2019, is hereby recognized as World Lupus Day, on which lupus organizations around the globe call attention to the need for increases in public and private sector funding for medical research on lupus, education programs for health professionals, and improved access to quality medical care for people with lupus; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.