LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR44
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR44
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR44
Action History
Senate
06/24/2019
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1706.)
Senate
06/19/2019
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Senate
06/18/2019
Ordered to second reading.
Senate
06/18/2019
Read third time and amended.
Senate
06/05/2019
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Senate
05/24/2019
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.