LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR47
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR47
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR47
Action History
Senate
07/05/2019
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 1954.)
Senate
07/03/2019
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1934.) (July 3).
Senate
06/18/2019
Set for hearing July 3.
Senate
06/12/2019
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Senate
06/05/2019
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.