Senate | 09/06/2019 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2603.) | ||
Senate | 07/08/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1993.) (July 8). | ||
Senate | 07/01/2019 | (Corrected September 9). | ||
Senate | 07/01/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2019 | Set for hearing July 8. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2019 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |