1 | | - | Enrolled July 01, 2019 Passed IN Senate June 27, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 49Introduced by Senator Glazer(Coauthors: Senators Allen, Archuleta, Bates, Borgeas, Caballero, Chang, Dodd, Galgiani, Hill, Hueso, Moorlach, Nielsen, Pan, Rubio, Stone, Wiener, and Wilk)June 10, 2019 Relative to Non-Small Cell Lung Cancer Awareness Week.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 49, Glazer. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Non-small cell lung cancer (NSCLC) is a disease in which malignant (cancer) cells form in the tissues of the lung. It is the most common form of lung cancer and one of two major types of lung cancer; andWHEREAS, Approximately 230,000 new cases of lung cancer are estimated to be diagnosed in the United States in 2019. NSCLC accounts for 84 percent of new lung cancer cases diagnosed in the United States annually; andWHEREAS, Signs of NSCLC include a cough that does not go away and shortness of breath; andWHEREAS, Tests and procedures to detect, diagnose, and determine the stage of NSCLC include physical examination and history, laboratory tests, chest X-rays, computerized tomography (CT) scans, sputum cytology, and thoracentesis; andWHEREAS, NSCLC can affect both smokers and nonsmokers. However, currently, it mostly affects smokers; andWHEREAS, Approximately 20 percent of people who die from lung cancer in the United States have never smoked. Two-thirds of nonsmokers who have lung cancer are women. Nonsmoking Asian women are disproportionately represented and are more vulnerable to lung cancer than other groups; andWHEREAS, Lung cancer in nonsmokers can be caused by exposure to radon, secondhand smoke, air pollution, or other factors. Workplace exposures to asbestos, diesel exhaust, or certain other chemicals can also cause lung cancers in people who do not smoke. Accordingly, it is important for people to avoid secondhand smoke, have their home checked for radon, and be careful at work; andWHEREAS, If NSCLC is localized, there is a 60-percent likelihood that the person will live for at least five years after being diagnosed. However, if NSCLC is discovered later, there is only a 6-percent likelihood that the person will live for at least five years. The sooner NSCLC is diagnosed, the greater the likelihood that the person will live longer; andWHEREAS, Currently, promising results exist in immunotherapy for NSCLC for patients who have the matching genomic mutations or driver mutations, and the recent approval of multiple types of immunotherapy is leading to more research on the use of these drugs to help the immune system control NSCLC growth; andWHEREAS, Researchers are also using personalized drug therapy to predict whether a specific drug, such as chemotherapy or targeted therapy, may be effective in fighting the features of lung tumors; andWHEREAS, The Jeanette Fritzky Foundation is a group whose mission is to educate and create awareness for women of Asian descent, their doctors, and the medical profession regarding the prevalence of, causes of, and treatment options for, NSCLC and other cancers; andWHEREAS, Currently, the Jeanette Fritzky Foundation focuses on communities in the San Francisco Bay Area but hopes to expand to all of California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate proclaims the week of June 24, 2019, to June 30, 2019, inclusive, as Non-Small Cell Lung Cancer Awareness Week in the State of California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 49Introduced by Senator Glazer(Coauthors: Senators Allen, Archuleta, Bates, Borgeas, Caballero, Chang, Dodd, Galgiani, Hill, Hueso, Moorlach, Nielsen, Pan, Rubio, Stone, Wiener, and Wilk)June 10, 2019 Relative to Non-Small Cell Lung Cancer Awareness Week.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 49, as introduced, Glazer. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Non-small cell lung cancer (NSCLC) is a disease in which malignant (cancer) cells form in the tissues of the lung. It is the most common form of lung cancer and one of two major types of lung cancer; andWHEREAS, Approximately 230,000 new cases of lung cancer are estimated to be diagnosed in the United States in 2019. NSCLC accounts for 84 percent of new lung cancer cases diagnosed in the United States annually; andWHEREAS, Signs of NSCLC include a cough that does not go away and shortness of breath; andWHEREAS, Tests and procedures to detect, diagnose, and determine the stage of NSCLC include physical examination and history, laboratory tests, chest X-rays, computerized tomography (CT) scans, sputum cytology, and thoracentesis; andWHEREAS, NSCLC can affect both smokers and nonsmokers. However, currently, it mostly affects smokers; andWHEREAS, Approximately 20 percent of people who die from lung cancer in the United States have never smoked. Two-thirds of nonsmokers who have lung cancer are women. Nonsmoking Asian women are disproportionately represented and are more vulnerable to lung cancer than other groups; andWHEREAS, Lung cancer in nonsmokers can be caused by exposure to radon, secondhand smoke, air pollution, or other factors. Workplace exposures to asbestos, diesel exhaust, or certain other chemicals can also cause lung cancers in people who do not smoke. Accordingly, it is important for people to avoid secondhand smoke, have their home checked for radon, and be careful at work; andWHEREAS, If NSCLC is localized, there is a 60-percent likelihood that the person will live for at least five years after being diagnosed. However, if NSCLC is discovered later, there is only a 6-percent likelihood that the person will live for at least five years. The sooner NSCLC is diagnosed, the greater the likelihood that the person will live longer; andWHEREAS, Currently, promising results exist in immunotherapy for NSCLC for patients who have the matching genomic mutations or driver mutations, and the recent approval of multiple types of immunotherapy is leading to more research on the use of these drugs to help the immune system control NSCLC growth; andWHEREAS, Researchers are also using personalized drug therapy to predict whether a specific drug, such as chemotherapy or targeted therapy, may be effective in fighting the features of lung tumors; andWHEREAS, The Jeanette Fritzky Foundation is a group whose mission is to educate and create awareness for women of Asian descent, their doctors, and the medical profession regarding the prevalence of, causes of, and treatment options for, NSCLC and other cancers; andWHEREAS, Currently, the Jeanette Fritzky Foundation focuses on communities in the San Francisco Bay Area but hopes to expand to all of California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate proclaims the week of June 24, 2019, to June 30, 2019, inclusive, as Non-Small Cell Lung Cancer Awareness Week in the State of California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|