California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR53 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/20/2019

                            Enrolled  August 20, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  August 19, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 53Introduced by Senator HertzbergAugust 12, 2019 Relative to California Native American Day and the California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 53, Hertzberg. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, California is home to more federally recognized Indian tribes than any other state in the United States; andWHEREAS, The cultural and governmental contributions of the native peoples of California have shaped the course of the state throughout history; andWHEREAS, California designated the fourth Friday of every September as California Native American Day; andWHEREAS, California Native American Day is celebrated in this state by tribes and communities across the state, and is a day for educators of California to teach factual California Indian history in schools; andWHEREAS, California Indian tribes are committed to contributing to the educational curricula provided by the state and believe in providing new and improved educational resources about the varied cultural histories of, and governance models used by, California Native Americans; andWHEREAS, The California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference will be held concurrently with California Native American Day and will assist educators by providing new educational resources regarding the rich and varied lives of the California Indian nations; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Legislature recognizes the importance of California Native American Day, celebrated this year on September 27, 2019, and the annual California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference to the enhancement of awareness of California Indian culture; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  August 20, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  August 19, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 53Introduced by Senator HertzbergAugust 12, 2019 Relative to California Native American Day and the California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 53, Hertzberg. Digest Key

 Enrolled  August 20, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  August 19, 2019

Enrolled  August 20, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  August 19, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 53

Introduced by Senator HertzbergAugust 12, 2019

Introduced by Senator Hertzberg
August 12, 2019

 Relative to California Native American Day and the California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 53, Hertzberg. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, California is home to more federally recognized Indian tribes than any other state in the United States; and

WHEREAS, The cultural and governmental contributions of the native peoples of California have shaped the course of the state throughout history; and

WHEREAS, California designated the fourth Friday of every September as California Native American Day; and

WHEREAS, California Native American Day is celebrated in this state by tribes and communities across the state, and is a day for educators of California to teach factual California Indian history in schools; and

WHEREAS, California Indian tribes are committed to contributing to the educational curricula provided by the state and believe in providing new and improved educational resources about the varied cultural histories of, and governance models used by, California Native Americans; and

WHEREAS, The California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference will be held concurrently with California Native American Day and will assist educators by providing new educational resources regarding the rich and varied lives of the California Indian nations; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Legislature recognizes the importance of California Native American Day, celebrated this year on September 27, 2019, and the annual California Indian Cultural Awareness Conference to the enhancement of awareness of California Indian culture; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.